SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-7337 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-7337 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Toforest Onesha Johnson, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:
April 20, 2023
Linked with 22A762
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
Case Numbers:
(CR-05-1805)
Decision Date:
May 6, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
August 26, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
December 16, 2022
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2023
Application (22A762) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 16, 2023 to April 17, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Feb 23 2023
Application (22A762) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 17, 2023.
Apr 17 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 22, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Proof of Service
May 09 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 22, 2023 to June 21, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 11 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2023.
May 22 2023
Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Graves filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Other
May 22 2023
Brief amicus curiae of The Innocence Project filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 14 2023
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 27 2023
Reply of petitioner Toforest Johnson filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 29 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Oct 02 2023
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Mark Mulvaney
Counsel of Record
Southern Center for Human Rights
60 Walton Street, NW
Atlanta, GA 30303
PMULVANEY@SCHR.ORG
4046881202
Party name: Toforest Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
J. Clayton Crenshaw
Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130
CCRENSHAW@AGO.STATE.AL.US
334-242-7300
Party name: State of Alabama
Other
Lindsey C Boney IV
Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203
lboney@bradley.com
2055218914
Party name: The Innocence Project
Brian Robert Matsui
Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2100 L Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20037
BMATSUI@MOFO.COM
202-887-8784
Party name: Anthony Graves
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##