Docket for 22-7309 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Feb 01 2023 | Application (22A723) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 13, 2023 to April 14, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | Feb 07 2023 | Application (22A723) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 14, 2023. | | | Apr 14 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 18, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | May 09 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2023 to June 19, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 20, 2023. See Rule 30.1 | | | Jun 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 20, 2023 to July 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 20, 2023. | | | Jul 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 20, 2023 to August 21, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 21, 2023. | | | Aug 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 21, 2023 to September 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 20, 2023. | | | Sep 20 2023 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 02 2023 | Reply of petitioner James H. Roane, Jr. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentOther | Oct 05 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023. | | | Oct 30 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|