SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-7222 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-7222 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Ray Dansby, Petitioner
v.
Dexter Payne, Director, Arkansas Division of Correction
Docketed:
April 5, 2023
Linked with 22A659
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-3006, 19-3105)
Decision Date:
August 25, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
November 2, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2023
Application (22A659) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 31, 2023 to March 31, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jan 25 2023
Application (22A659) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 31, 2023.
Mar 31 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 5, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 05 2023
Brief of respondent Dexter Payne, Director, Arkansas Division of Correction in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 19 2023
Reply of petitioner Ray Dansby filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 24 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/8/2023.
Jun 12 2023
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Charles Williams
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
1401 West Capitol, Suite 490
Little Rock, AR 72201
john_c_williams@fd.org
501.324.6132
Party name: Ray Dansby
Attorneys for Respondent
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201
NICHOLAS.BRONNI@ARKANSASAG.GOV
501-682-6302
Party name: Dexter Payne
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##