SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-7136 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-7136 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Terry Froman, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
March 29, 2023
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Ohio, Warren County
Case Numbers:
(CA2020-12-080)
Decision Date:
August 8, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
December 27, 2022
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 27 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 28, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Apr 24 2023
Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 10 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023.
May 30 2023
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rachel Troutman
Counsel of Record
Ohio Public Defender
250 East Broad Street
Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215
RACHEL.TROUTMAN@OPD.OHIO.GOV
614-466-9323
Party name: Terry Froman
Attorneys for Respondent
David P. Fornshell
Counsel of Record
Warren County Prosecutor's Office
520 Justice Drive
Lebanon, OH 45036
DAVID.FORNSHELL@WARRENCOUNTYPROSECUTOR.COM
513-695-1325
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##