Docket for 22-7075 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Feb 07 2023 | Application (22A731) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 16, 2023 to March 20, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Feb 10 2023 | Application (22A731) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 20, 2023. | | | Mar 20 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 21, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Apr 13 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2023 to May 21, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2023. See Rule 30.1. | | | May 22 2023 | Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 07 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023. | | | Jun 26 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|