Docket for 22-6951 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 15 2022 | Application (22A547) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 2, 2023 to March 3, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 19 2022 | Application (22A547) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 3, 2023. | | | Mar 03 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 6, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Mar 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2023 to May 8, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 8, 2023. | | | May 08 2023 | Brief of respondent Dexter Payne, Director, Arkansas Division of Correction in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 22 2023 | Reply of petitioner Zachariah Marcyniuk filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | May 24 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/8/2023. | | | Jun 12 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|