Docket for 22-6909 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 20 2023 | Application (22A658) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2023 to March 1, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | Jan 24 2023 | Application (22A658) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 1, 2023. | | | Feb 28 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 3, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 09 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 3, 2023 to May 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 10 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 3, 2023. | | | Apr 28 2023 | Brief of respondent Ronald Davis, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 08 2023 | Reply of petitioner Curtis Lynn Fauber filed. | | Main Document | May 17 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/1/2023. | | | Jun 05 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|