Docket for 22-6772 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 01 2022 | Application (22A492) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 12, 2022 to February 10, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 06 2022 | Application (22A492) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 10, 2023. | | | Feb 10 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 16, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Mar 02 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2023 to April 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 03 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 17, 2023. | | | Apr 17 2023 | Brief of respondents Bryan Stirling, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 28 2023 | Reply of petitioner Marion Bowman, Jr. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 03 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/18/2023. | | | May 22 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|