Docket for 22-6629 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 13 2022 | Application (22A533) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2022 to February 23, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | Dec 15 2022 | Application (22A533) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 24, 2023. | | | Jan 10 2023 | Application (22A533) to extend further the time from January 24, 2023 to February 23, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Written Request | Jan 13 2023 | Application (22A533) denied by Justice Thomas. | | | Jan 24 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 27, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of Service | Feb 14 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2023 to March 29, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2023. | | | Mar 29 2023 | Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 12 2023 | Reply of petitioner Keith Edmund Gavin filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023. | | | May 01 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|