Docket for 22-6594 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 10 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 22, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 14 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 22, 2023 to March 24, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 24, 2023. | | | Mar 07 2023 | Letter from petitioner dated March 7, 2023 filed. | | Main Document | Mar 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 24, 2023 to April 24, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 24, 2023. | | | Apr 20 2023 | Brief of respondent Oak Smith, Acting Warden in opposition filed. | | Main Document | May 05 2023 | Reply of petitioner James Michael Fayed filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 10 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023. | | | May 30 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|