Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-6500 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-6500 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Richard Eugene Glossip, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:January 9, 2023
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PCD-2022-819)
   Decision Date:November 17, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 8, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendixAppendixProof of ServiceProof of ServicePetition
Jan 11 2023Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Current and Former State and Federal Prosecutors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Oklahoma State Representative Kevin McDugle filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 24 2023Reply of petitioner Richard Glossip filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Feb 03 2023Record Requested.
Feb 21 2023Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma (1 box).
Feb 23 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023.
Feb 27 2023Rescheduled.
Mar 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023.
Mar 20 2023Rescheduled.
Mar 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/31/2023.
Mar 27 2023Rescheduled.
Apr 10 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023.
Apr 10 2023Rescheduled.
Apr 17 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023.
Apr 17 2023Rescheduled.
Apr 24 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023.
Apr 25 2023Rescheduled.
May 05 2023Application (22A941) for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is granted pending the disposition of the petitions for writs of certiorari, Nos. 22-6500 and 22-7466. Should both petitions for writs of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event either petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the mandate of this Court. Justice Gorsuch took not part in the consideration or decision of this application.
May 08 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023.
May 09 2023Rescheduled.
Jul 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Oct 02 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023.
Oct 10 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023.
Oct 23 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023.
Nov 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Nov 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Jan 02 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Jan 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024.
Jan 16 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amy Pickering Knight
    Counsel of Record
Knight Law Firm, PC
3849 E Broadway Blvd #288
Tucson, AZ 85716

amy@amyknightlaw.com
520-878-8849
Party name: Richard Glossip
John Robert MillsPhillips Black
1721 Broadway
Suite 201
Oakland, CA 94612

J.MILLS@PHILLIPSBLACK.ORG
888-532-0897
Party name: Richard Glossip
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer L. Crabb
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Oklahoma
Other
Devi Maheswari Rao
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H Street NE
Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

DEVI.RAO@MACARTHURJUSTICE.ORG
202-869-3434
Party name: Oklahoma State Representative Kevin McDugle
David A. Senior
    Counsel of Record
McBreen & Senior
1901 Avenue of the Stars
Suite 450
Los Angeles, CA 90067

DSENIOR@MCBREENSENIOR.COM
13105525300
Party name: Current and Former State and Federal Prosecutors
Ann-Kathryn Rose TriaMcBreen & Senior
1901 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 450
Los Angeles, CA 90067

ATRIA@MCBREENSENIOR.COM
(310) 552-5300
Party name: Current and Former State and Federal Prosecutors

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543