SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-6488 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-6488 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
John F. Mosley, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
January 9, 2023
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC20-195)
Decision Date:
September 15, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
October 11, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 05 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 8, 2023)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Feb 08 2023
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 15 2023
Reply of petitioner John F. Mosley filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 23 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023.
Mar 20 2023
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Barbara Jane Busharis
Counsel of Record
Public Defender's Office, Second Judicial Circuit
301 S. Monroe St.
Tallahassee, FL 32301
barbara.busharis@flpd2.com
8505675210
Party name: John F. Mosley, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
CAROLYN.SNURKOWSKI@MYFLORIDALEGAL.COM
850-414-3566
Party name: Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##