Docket for 22-637
|
Jan 06 2023 | Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due February 10, 2023) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 26 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 15 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/3/2023. | | | Mar 06 2023 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh and Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | | Mar 29 2023 | Petition for Rehearing filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 05 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023. | | | Apr 24 2023 | Rehearing DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh and Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|