Oct 25 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 3, 2023) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Dec 21 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2023 to February 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 22 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 17, 2023. |
| |
Feb 17 2023 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Mar 09 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. |
| |
Mar 14 2023 | Reply of petitioner Albert Holland filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Mar 27 2023 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
| |
Apr 10 2023 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
May 02 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/18/2023. |
| |
May 22 2023 | Rehearing DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. See 28 U.S.C. ยง455(b)(3) and Code of Conduct for U.S. Judges, Canon 3C(1)(e) (prior government employment). |
| |