Sep 01 2022 | Application (22A205) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 15, 2022 to October 31, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions |
Sep 08 2022 | Application (22A205) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 31, 2022. |
| |
Oct 31 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 5, 2022) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Dec 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 5, 2022 to January 4, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 02 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 4, 2023. |
| |
Dec 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 4, 2023 to February 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 21 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 3, 2023. |
| |
Feb 03 2023 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count |
Feb 16 2023 | Reply of petitioner Richard Allen Jackson filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Feb 23 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023. |
| |
Mar 20 2023 | Petition DENIED. |
| |