Docket for 22-5906 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 07 2022 | Application (22A214) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 21, 2022 to November 20, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 12 2022 | Application (22A214) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 21, 2022. | | | Oct 21 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 25, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Nov 22 2022 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 08 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. | | | Jan 09 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | | Feb 27 2023 | Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioner. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceOther | Mar 08 2023 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. | | | Mar 27 2023 | Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioner DENIED. | | |
|