SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-5900 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-5900 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Robert Bethel, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
October 25, 2022
Linked with 22A39
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Ohio
Case Numbers:
(2020-0648)
Decision Date:
March 22, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
May 24, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 14 2022
Application (22A39) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 22, 2022 to October 21, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 19 2022
Application (22A39) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until October 21, 2022.
Oct 21 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 25, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
Nov 04 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2022 to January 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 9, 2023.
Jan 06 2023
Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 26 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 26 2023
Reply of petitioner Robert Bethel filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 21 2023
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rachel Troutman
Counsel of Record
Ohio Public Defender
250 East Broad Street
Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215
rachel.troutman@opd.ohio.gov
614-466-9323
Party name: Robert Bethel
Attorneys for Respondent
Seth Luxon Gilbert
Counsel of Record
Franklin County Prosecuting Attorney
373 South High Street
13th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215
sgilbert@franklincountyohio.gov
6145253555
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##