SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-5736 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-5736 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Ernesto Salgado Martinez, Petitioner
v.
David Shinn, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections, Rehabilitation and Reentry, et al.
Docketed:
October 3, 2022
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(21-99006)
Decision Date:
May 16, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
July 1, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 28 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 2, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Oct 06 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2022 to December 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 07 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 1, 2022.
Nov 28 2022
Brief of respondent David Shinn, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections, Rehabilitation and Reentry, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 15 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy M. Gabrielsen
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
407 W. Congress, Ste. 501
Suite 501
Tucson, AZ 85701
tim_gabrielsen@fd.org
520-879-7614
Party name: Ernesto Martinez
Attorneys for Respondent
Laura Patrice Chiasson
Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General
400 W. Congress, Suite S-215
Tucson, AZ 85701
laura.chiasson@azag.gov
5206286520
Party name: David Shinn
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##