Docket for 22-5731 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 11 2022 | Application (22A35) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 2, 2022 to October 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jul 15 2022 | Application (22A35) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until October 1, 2022. | | | Sep 26 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 2, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Oct 19 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2022 to December 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 2, 2022. | | | Dec 02 2022 | Brief of respondent Kansas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 22 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. | | | Dec 23 2022 | Reply of petitioner Jonathan D. Carr filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 09 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|