Docket for 22-5536 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 27 2022 | Application (22A2) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 7, 2022 to September 5, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceProof of Service | Jun 30 2022 | Application (22A2) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 5, 2022. | | | Sep 06 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 11, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 27 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 11, 2022 to November 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 28 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 10, 2022. | | | Nov 10 2022 | Brief of respondents Bryan P. Stirling, Commissioner, South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 23 2022 | Reply of petitioner Mikal Mahdi filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 01 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. | | | Jan 09 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|