SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-5513 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-5513 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Jerome Jenkins, Jr., Petitioner
v.
South Carolina
Docketed:
September 6, 2022
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of South Carolina
Case Numbers:
(28089)
Decision Date:
April 6, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
June 7, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 6, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Proof of Service
Oct 05 2022
Brief of respondent South Carolina in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 17 2022
Reply of petitioner Jerome Jenkins filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 20 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 07 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Michael Dudek Jr.
Counsel of Record
SC Office of Appellate Defense
South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense
1330 Lady Street, Suite 401
Columbia, SC 29201-3332
Rdudek@sccid.sc.gov
803-734-1330
Party name: Jerome Jenkins
Attorneys for Respondent
William Edgar Salter III
Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
P.O.Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211
esalter@scag.gov
803-734-6305
Party name: State of South Carolina
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##