SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-5432 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-5432 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Terence Valentine, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
August 23, 2022
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC20-1805)
Decision Date:
April 7, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
May 23, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 19 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 22, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Sep 22 2022
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 06 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 31 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marie-Louise Samuels Parmer
Counsel of Record
Samuels Parmer Law, P.A.
P.O. Box 18988
Tampa, FL 33679
marie@parmerdeliberato.com
813-732-3321
Party name: Terence Valentine
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##