Docket for 22-5218 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 22 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 29, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of Service | Aug 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 29, 2022 to October 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 02 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 28, 2022. | | | Oct 19 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2022 to December 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 2, 2022. | | | Dec 02 2022 | Brief of respondent Kansas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 16 2022 | Reply of petitioner Reginald Carr filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 22 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. | | | Jan 09 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|