Docket for 22-5109 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 27 2022 | Application (21A676) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 11, 2022 to July 10, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | May 03 2022 | Application (21A676) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 10, 2022. | | | Jul 11 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 15, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jul 27 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 15, 2022 to September 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 14, 2022. | | | Sep 13 2022 | Brief of respondent Ron Broomfield, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 20 2022 | Reply of petitioner Teddy Sanchez filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 29 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022. | | | Oct 17 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|