Docket for 22-5073 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 29 2022 | Application (21A672) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 10, 2022 to June 9, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | May 03 2022 | Application (21A672) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 9, 2022. | | | May 27 2022 | Application (21A672) to extend further the time from June 9, 2022 to July 9, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Written RequestProof of Service | Jun 01 2022 | Application (21A672) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 9, 2022. | | | Jul 08 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 11, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 09 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 11, 2022 to September 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 10 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 12, 2022. See Rule 30.1. | | | Sep 07 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 12, 2022 to October 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 08 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 12, 2022. | | | Oct 12 2022 | Brief of David Shinn, et al. in opposition not accepted for filing.(Corrected version submitted) (October 18, 2022) | | | Oct 12 2022 | Brief of respondents David Shinn, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Oct 25 2022 | Reply of Leroy McGill not accepted for filing. (October 26, 2022--corrected version submitted) | | | Oct 25 2022 | Reply of petitioner Leroy McGill filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Oct 26 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/10/2022. | | | Nov 14 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|