Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-5058 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-5058 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Davel Chinn, Petitioner
v.
Tim Shoop, Warden
Docketed:July 11, 2022
Linked with 21A678
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3982)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 21 2022Application (21A678) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 5, 2022 to July 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 04 2022Application (21A678) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 4, 2022.
Jul 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 10, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of ServiceProof of Service
Aug 03 2022Brief of respondent Tim Shoop in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 17 2022Reply of petitioner Davel Chinn filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Oct 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022.
Oct 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 07 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Jackson, with whom Justice Sotomayor joins, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rachel Troutman
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Public Defender
250 East Broad Street
Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215

rachel.troutman@opd.ohio.gov
614-466-9323
Party name: Davel Chinn
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Tim Shoop

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543