Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-46
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-46
Title:Ada County, Idaho, Petitioner
v.
Idaho Commission for Reapportionment, et al.
Docketed:July 18, 2022
Linked with 21A740
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(49261-2021, 49267-2021, 49295-2021, 49353-2021)
   Decision Date:March 1, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2022Application (21A740) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 30, 2022 to July 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
May 19 2022Application (21A740) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 14, 2022.
Jul 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2022Waiver of right of respondent Idaho Commission for Reapportionment, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lorna K. Jorgensen
    Counsel of Record
Ada County Prosecuting Attorney
200 W. Front Street
Room 3191
Boise, ID 83702

ljorgensen@adaweb.net
2082877700
Party name: Ada County
Attorneys for Respondents
Megan Ann Larrondo
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Idaho
954 W. Jefferson -2nd Floor
Boise, ID 83720-0010

megan.larrondo@ag.idaho.gov
208-332-3548
Party name: Idaho Commission for Reapportionment, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543