Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-429
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-429
Title:Acheson Hotels, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Deborah Laufer
Docketed:November 8, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1410)
   Decision Date:October 5, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 8, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Waiver of right of respondent Deborah Laufer to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 08 2022Brief amici curiae of Restaurant Law Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of DRI Center for Law and Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 08 2022Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Responsibility filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2022Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 19 2022Response Requested. (Due January 18, 2023)
Jan 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2023 to February 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 10 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 17, 2023.
Feb 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 17, 2023 to March 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including February 27, 2023.
Feb 24 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Feb 24 2023Brief of respondent Deborah Laufer in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 28 2023Reply of petitioner Acheson Hotels, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023.
Mar 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023.
Mar 27 2023Petition GRANTED.
Apr 14 2023Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 5, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 2, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Acheson Hotels, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas Burns Bacon
    Counsel of Record
Thomas B. Bacon, P.A.
1317 Edgewater Drive
Suite 556
Orlando, FL 32804

TBB@THOMASBACONLAW.COM
9544787811
Party name: Deborah Laufer
Kelsi Brown CorkranInstitute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

KBC74@GEORGETOWN.EDU
202-661-6728
Party name: Deborah Laufer
Other
Dylan Bradley Carp
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Lewis P.C.
50 California Street
9th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

dylan.carp@jacksonlewis.com
415-394-9400
Party name: Restaurant Law Center
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc., and National Retail Federation
Steven Paul Lehotsky
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
200 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

steve@lehotskykeller.com
5126938350
Party name: Center for Constitutional Responsibility
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP
2001 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mark.perry@weil.com
(202) 682-7000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Resort Development Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, and International Council of Shopping Centers
Sarah Elizabeth Spencer
    Counsel of Record
Christensen & Jensen
257 East 200 South, Suite 1100
Suite 800
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sarah.spencer@chrisjen.com
8013235000
Party name: DRI Center for Law and Public Policy

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543