Docket for 22-250
|
Sep 13 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2022) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 11 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Gavin Newsom, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Oct 19 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022. | | | Oct 28 2022 | Response Requested. (Due November 28, 2022) | | | Nov 08 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 28, 2022 to December 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 09 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 28, 2022. | | | Dec 27 2022 | Motion of California Constitutional Rights Foundation and Faith and Freedom Advocates for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (December 30, 2022) | | | Dec 27 2022 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by California Constitutional Rights Foundation. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 28 2022 | Brief of respondents Gavin Newsom, Governor of California, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 06 2023 | Reply of petitioners Matthew Brach, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 11 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. | | | Feb 21 2023 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by California Constitutional Rights Foundation DENIED. | | | Feb 21 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|