Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-227
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-227
Title:Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al., Petitioners
v.
Brian W. Coughlin
Docketed:September 12, 2022
Linked with 22A23
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1153)
   Decision Date:May 6, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 08 2022Application (22A23) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 4, 2022 to September 8, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 13 2022Application (22A23) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 8, 2022.
Sep 08 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2022 to November 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2022. See Rule 30.1.
Oct 12 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors of Federal Indian Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Native American Financial Services Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 08 2022Brief of respondent Brian W. Coughlin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2022Reply of petitioners Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023.
Jan 13 2023Petition GRANTED.
Jan 31 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 24, 2023.
Feb 08 2023Record requested from the U.S.C.A.-1st Circuit.
Feb 16 2023All records from the U.S.C.A.-1st Circuit are available on PACER. Record request was transmitted to the Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court for response.
Feb 16 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2023Brief of petitioners Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2023Brief amici curiae of The Navajo Nation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2023Brief amici curiae of Indian Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Mar 10 2023All records from the Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court are available on PACER.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gregory Gerber Rapawy
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, N.W.
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

grapawy@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7967
Party name: Brian W. Coughlin
Other
Tyson Clinton Kade
    Counsel of Record
Van Ness Feldman, LLP
1050 Thomas Jefferson Street, NW, Seventh Floor
Washington, DC 20007

tck@vnf.com
2022981948
Party name: Native American Financial Services Association
Kaighn Smith Jr.Drummond Woodsum & MacMahon
84 Marginal Way
Suite 600
Portland, ME 04101

KSMITH@DWMLAW.COM
207-253-0559
Party name: Professors of Federal Indian Law
Paul Wesley Spruhan
    Counsel of Record
Navajo Naton Department of Justice
P.O. Box 2010
Window Rock, Navajo Nation, AZ 86515

PSPRUHAN@NNDOJ.ORG
928-871-6210
Party name: The Navajo Nation
April Dennise Youpee-Roll
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
350 South Grand Ave., 50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

APRIL.YOUPEE-ROLL@MTO.COM
213-683-9536
Party name: Professors of Federal Indian Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543