Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-204
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-204
Title:Melissa Elaine Klein, et vir, Petitioners
v.
Oregon Bureau of Labor and Industries
Docketed:September 7, 2022
Linked with 22A73
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Oregon
   Case Numbers:(A159899)
   Decision Date:January 26, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 5, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2022Application (22A73) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 3, 2022 to September 2, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Application (22A73) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 2, 2022.
Sep 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Melissa Elaine Klein, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2022 to November 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 14 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Oregon Bureau of Labor and Industries
Blanket Consent
Sep 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 7, 2022.
Sep 30 2022Brief amici curiae of Masterpiece Cakeshop Customers Stephanie Luck, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2022Brief amici curiae of Manhattan Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Faith and Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 07 2022Brief amici curiae of United States Senators and Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2022Brief amici curiae of America’s Future, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Alabama Center for Law and Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2022Brief amici curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2022Amicus brief of Advancing American Freedom, Inc. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted)(October 12, 2022)
Oct 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Advancing American Freedom, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 7, 2022 to December 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 7, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

mccotter@boydengrayassociates.com
202-706-5488
Party name: Melissa Elaine Klein, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: Oregon Bureau of Labor and Industries
Other
Zachary Paul West
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Office of the Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

zach.west@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Bruce N. Cameron
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Def. Foundation
8001 Braddock Road
Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

bnc@nrtw.org
(703) 321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Christian Legal Society, Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty, and Coalition for Jewish Values
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-530-0519
Party name: Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

lawyerdeborah@outlook.com
9103264554
Party name: Institute for Faith and Family
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Attorneys
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 324-1812
Party name: Constitutional Attorneys
Erin Marie Erhardt
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

eerhardt@mslegal.org
6364480410
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: America’s Future, Inc., Public Advocate of the United States, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 North Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Manhattan Institute
52 Vanderbilt Ave
New York City, NY 10017

ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org
212599-7000
Party name: Manhattan Institute, Committee for Justice, and Cato Institute
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Suite 2
Lansing, MI 48917

Prof.WWJD@gmail.com
517-322-3207
Party name: Masterpiece Cakeshop Customers Stephanie Luck, et al.
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 200042729

mwheat@advancingamericanfreedom.com
202-780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
Jonathan Radford Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jonathan R. Whitehead, LLC
229 SE Douglas St., Ste 210
Lee's Summit, MO 64063

jon@whiteheadlawllc.com
18163988305
Party name: United States Senators and Representatives

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543