Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-200
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-200
Title:Slack Technologies, LLC, fka Slack Technologies, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Fiyyaz Pirani
Docketed:September 2, 2022
Linked with 22A36
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-16419)
   Decision Date:September 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 2, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 13 2022Application (22A36) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 31, 2022 to August 31, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 18 2022Application (22A36) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 31, 2022.
Aug 31 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Slack Technologies, LLC, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 3, 2022 to November 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 2, 2022.
Sep 30 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Cato Institute.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Joseph A. Grundfest.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 02 2022Brief of respondent Fiyyaz Pirani in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Investor filed. (11/14/2022) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2022Reply of petitioners Slack Technologies, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.
Dec 13 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Cato Institute GRANTED.
Dec 13 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Joseph A. Grundfest GRANTED.
Dec 13 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation GRANTED.
Dec 13 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. GRANTED.
Dec 13 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jan 27 2023Brief of Slack Technologies, LLC, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2023Joint Appendix submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas G. Hungar
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

thungar@gibsondunn.com
(202) 887-3784
Party name: Slack Technologies, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lawrence Paul Eagel
    Counsel of Record
Bragar Eagel Squire, PC
810 Seventh Ave., Suite 620
New York, NY 10019

eagel@bespc.com
212-308-5888
Party name: Fiyyaz Pirani
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
John Christopher Browne
    Counsel of Record
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP
1251 Avenue of the Americas, 44th Fl.
New York, NY 10020

JohnB@blbglaw.com
212-554-1398
Party name: Investor
Boris Feldman
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
855 Main Street
Redwood City, CA 94063

boris.feldman@freshfields.com
650-618-9250
Party name: Joseph A. Grundfest
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
(617) 526-6000
Party name: Cato Institute
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543