Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-1130
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-1130
Title:74 Pinehurst LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:May 19, 2023
Linked with 22A955
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-467, 21-558)
   Decision Date:February 6, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 28 2023Application (22A955) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 7, 2023 to June 7, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 03 2023Application (22A955) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 7, 2023.
May 17 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 20, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 20, 2023 to August 21, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 06 2023Brief amici curiae of California Apartment Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 21, 2023, for all respondents.
Jun 09 2023Amicus brief of National Apartment Association, et al. (corrected efiling to be submitted). (June 09, 2023)
Jun 09 2023Brief amici curiae of National Apartment Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 09 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 13 2023Brief amicus curiae of Alexander Gallo filed. (also in 22-1095, 22-1170) VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Small Property Owners - NY, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of New York Association of RealtorsĀ®, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 20 2023Amicus brief of Liberty Justice Center not accepted for filing. Corrected version submitted (June 22, 2023)
Jun 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Liberty Justice Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Professor Richard A. Epstein, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief of State Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Brief of respondents City of New York, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Brief of respondents N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors, Community Voices Heard, and the Coalition for the Homeless in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Aug 29 2023Reply of petitioners 74 Pinehurst LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Oct 02 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023.
Oct 10 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023.
Oct 23 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023.
Nov 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Nov 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

MMOSIER@COV.COM
202-662-5435
Party name: 74 Pinehurst LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

RDEARING@LAW.NYC.GOV
2123562500
Party name: City of New York, New York City Rent Guidelines Board, David Reiss, Alex Schwartz, Arpit Gupta, Christian Gonzalez-Rivera, Christina DeRose, Robert Ehrlich, Christina Smyth, Sheila Garcia, Adan Soltren
Faith Elizabeth Gay
    Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
17th Floor
New York, NY 10104

fgay@selendygay.com
2123909001
Party name: N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors, Community Voices Heard, and the Coalition for the Homeless
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, Division of Housing & Community Renewal, and Visnauskas
Other
Robert Daniel Alt
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye lnstitute
88 East Broad Street, Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

ROBERT@BUCKEYEINSTITUTE.ORG
614-224-4422
Party name: Professor Richard A. Epstein and the Buckeye Institute
Saeid Baradaran Amini
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Saeid B. Amini
730 24th Street, NW
Suite One
Washington, DC 20037

sbajd98@yahoo.com
2023069444
Party name: Alexander Gallo
Anastasia Paulinna Boden
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

aboden@cato.org
202-216-1414
Party name: Cato Institute
Matthew M. Collette
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail LLP
1000 Maine Avenue, SW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024

mcollette@masseygail.com
3016468695
Party name: New York Association of RealtorsĀ®, Inc.
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJAY@GOODWINLAW.COM
2023464190
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
E. Christopher Murray
    Counsel of Record
Rivkin Radler LLP
926 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556-0926

e.murray@rivkin.com
516-357-3000
Party name: Small Property Owners - NY, Inc.
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 North Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

JSchwab@LJC.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Brett A. Shumate
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

BSHUMATE@JONESDAY.COM
2028793939
Party name: National Apartment Association, et al.
Christopher Elliott Skinnell
    Counsel of Record
Nielsen Merksamer Parrinello Gross and Leoni
2350 Kerner Blvd.
Suite 250
San Rafael, CA 94901

cskinnell@nmgovlaw.com
415-389-6800
Party name: California Apartment Association & San Francisco Apartment Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543