Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-1078
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-1078
Title:Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Sherman Nealy, et al.
Docketed:May 5, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-13232)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2023Brief amici curiae of Krystina L. Cavazos, et al. filed
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Recording Industry Association of America and National Music Publishers’ Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2023Brief of respondents Sherman Nealy, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Jun 21 2023Reply of petitioners Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether, under the discovery accrual rule applied by the circuit courts and the Copyright Act's statute of limitations for civil actions, 17 U. S. C. §507(b), a copyright plaintiff can recover damages for acts that allegedly occurred more than three years before the filing of a lawsuit.
Oct 24 2023Motion for an extension of time file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Oct 24 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al.
Main Document
Oct 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including November 24, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 5, 2024.
Nov 06 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Nov 27 2023Brief of petitioners Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of Tyler T. Ochoa in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2023Brief amici curiae of Southwestern Law Student Krystina Cavazos, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Publishers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Recording Industry Association of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, Authors Alliance, American Library Association an Association of Research Libraries filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of McHale & Slavin, P.A. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joe Wesley Earnhardt
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

WEarnhardt@cravath.com
2124741000
Party name: Sherman Nealy, et al.
Chelsea Ann LewisLewis Law PLLC
8201 Peters Road, Suite 1000
Plantation, FL 33324

chelsea@lewislawesq.com
954-869-8456
Party name: Sherman Nealy, et al.
Robert Allen RosenbergThe KLK Law Firm (Of Counsel)
8751 W Broward Blvd Ste. 105
Plantation, FL 33324

grebnesor1942@gmail.com
9545404713
Party name: Sherman Nealy, et al.
Antony L. RyanCravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

aryan@cravath.com
212-474-1296
Party name: Sherman Nealy, et al.
Other
Nicole Bergstrom
    Counsel of Record
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
28 Liberty Street, 35th Floor
New York, NY 10005

nbergstrom@fkks.com
(212) 980-0120
Party name: Association of American Publishers
Michael Meredith Epstein
    Counsel of Record
Amicus Project at Southwestern Law School
3050 Wilshire Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90010

amicusproject@swlaw.edu
2137386774
Party name: Southwestern Law Student Krystina Cavazos, et al.
Andrew David Lockton
    Counsel of Record
McHale & Slavin, P.A.
2855 PGA Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

alockton@mchaleslavin.com
561-625-6575
Party name: McHale & Slavin, P.A.
Tyler Trent Ochoa
    Counsel of Record
Santa Clara University School of Law
500 El Camino Real
Santa Clara, CA 95053

ttochoa@scu.edu
4085542765
Party name: Tyler T. Ochoa
Benjamin James Siders
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Rice LLC
600 Washington Avenue
Suite 2500, MO 63101

bsiders@lewisrice.com
314-444-7805
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Mitchell Leff Stoltz
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy St
San Francisco, CA 94109

mitch@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, Authors Alliance, American Library Association an Association of Research Libraries
Michael BarclayElectronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

michael@eff.org
4154369333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, Authors Alliance, American Library Association an Association of Research Libraries
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

ELAINE.GOLDENBERG@MTO.COM
202-220-1114
Party name: Recording Industry Association of America and National Music Publishers’ Association
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUNIKOWSKY@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543