SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21A61 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21A61 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Bryan P. Stirling, Director, South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al., Applicants
v.
Sammie Louis Stokes
Docketed:
October 7, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-6)
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 07 2021
Application (21A61) for a stay of mandate, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Oct 12 2021
Response to application (21A61) requested by The Chief Justice, due Tuesday, October 19, by 4 p.m.
Oct 19 2021
Response to application from respondent Sammie Stokes filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 21 2021
Reply of applicant Bryan Stirling, et al. filed.
Reply
Proof of Service
Oct 22 2021
Application (21A61) denied by The Chief Justice.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Melody Jane Brown
Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
Post Office Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211
mbrown@scag.gov
803-734-3742
Party name: Bryan Stirling, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Ashley C. Parrish
Counsel of Record
King & Spalding
1700 Pensylvania Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006-2706
aparrish@kslaw.com
202-626-2627
Party name: Sammie Stokes
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##