Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A258
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A258
Title:Republican National Committee, Applicant
v.
Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration, et al.
Docketed:December 20, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-7000, 21-4027, 21-4028, 21-4031, 21-4032, 21-4033, 21-4080, 21-4082, 21-4083, 21-4084, 21-4085, 21-4086, 21-4087, 21-4089, 21-4088, 21-4090, 21-4091, 21-4093, 21-4092, 21-4095, 21-4094, 21-4096, 4097, 21-4099, 21-4100, 21-4101, 21-4102)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2021Application (21A258) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Response to application (21A258) requested by Justice Kavanaugh, due by 4pm on Thursday, December 30, 2021.
Dec 22 2021Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by Former OSHA Administrators Charles Jeffress, David Michaels, and Gerard Scannell.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 23 2021A reply, if any, shall be filed by 10 am on Monday, January 3, 2022.
Dec 23 2021Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 27 2021Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by National Employment Lawyers Association and Jobs With Justice Educational Fund.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 28 2021Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Liberty, Life and Law Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 30 2021Response to application from respondents Occupational Safety & Health Administration, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 30 2021Response to application from respondents American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 30 2021Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by America's Frontline Doctors.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 30 2021Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by We The Patriots USA, Inc.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 30 2021Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by Advancing American Freedom.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 30 2021Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by Small Business Majority, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Reply of applicant Republican National Committee filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jan 05 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Jason Feliciano and the International Conference of Evangelical Chaplain Endorsers.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jan 05 2022Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Foundation for Moral Law.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Application (21A258) referred to the Court.
Jan 24 2022Application for stay (21A258) presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court dismissed in light of the relief granted in National Federation of Independent Business v. OSHA, 595 U. S. ___ (2022) (per curiam).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Eugene Toner
    Counsel of Record
Wiley, Rein & Fielding
2050 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mtoner@wiley.law
2027197000
Party name: Republican National Committee
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Occupational Safety & Health Administration, et al.
Randy S. Rabinowitz
    Counsel of Record
OSH Law Project, LLC
P.O. Box 3769
Washington, DC 20027

randy@oshlaw.org
2022564080
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Other
Allison M. Zieve
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

azieve@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Former Osha Administrators Charles Jeffress, David Michaels, and Gerard Scannell
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Michael Timothy Anderson
    Counsel of Record
Murphy Anderson PLLC
1401 K Street NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20005

manderson@murphypllc.com
6172275720
Party name: National Employment Lawyers Ass'n and Jobs With Justice Educational Fund
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

lawyerdeborah@outlook.com
(910) 326-4554
Party name: Liberty, Life and Law Foundation
Norman A. Pattis
    Counsel of Record
Pattis & Smith, LLC
383 Orange St
1st Floor
New Haven, CT 06511

npattis@pattisandsmith.com
203-393-3017
Party name: We The Patriots USA, Inc.
Matthew Jared Sheehan
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

matt@advancingamericanfreedom.com
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom
Richard Adam Koffman
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
1100 New York Ave NW Fifth Floor
Washington, DC, DC 20005

rkoffman@cohenmilstein.com
2024084674
Party name: Small Business Majority, et al.
Gregory James Glaser
    Counsel of Record
Greg Glaser, Attorney at Law
4399 Buckboard Drive #423
Copperopolis, CA 95228

greg@gregglaser.com
9256426651
Party name: America's Frontline Doctors
Arthur A. Schulcz Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Chaplains' Counsel, PLLC,
21043 Honeycreeper Pl.
Leesburg, VA 20175

art@chaplainscounsel.com
703-645-4010
Party name: Jason Feliciano and the International Conference of Evangelical Chaplain Endorsers
Mary Holland
    Counsel of Record
Children's Health Defense
1227 N. Peachtree Parkway
Suite 202
Peachtree City, GA 30269

mary.holland@childrenshealthdefense.org
2028541310
Party name: Nobel Laureate Dr. Luc Montagnier
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36064

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3342621245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543