Docket for 21-938 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 21 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 24, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 20 2022 | Waiver of Sammie Stokes of right to respond not accepted for filing. (January 28, 2022 - Waiver filed in error. See Rule 15.1) | | | Jan 31 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 24, 2022 to March 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 10, 2022. | | | Mar 10 2022 | Brief of respondent Sammie Stokes in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 29 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022. | | | Mar 29 2022 | Reply of petitioners Bryan Stirling, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 23 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022. | | | May 31 2022 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Shinn v. Martinez Ramirez, 596 U.S. ___ (2022). | | | Jul 05 2022 | JUDGMENT ISSUED | | |
|