Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-888
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-888
Title:Intel Corporation, Petitioner
v.
VLSI Technology LLC, et al.
Docketed:December 15, 2021
Linked with 21A115
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1614, 2021-1616, 2021-1617, 2021-1673, 2021-1674, 2021-1675, 2021-1676, 2021-1677, 2021-1738, 2021-1739, 2021-1740, 2021-1741)
   Decision Date:May 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 26, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 25 2021Application (21A115) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 24, 2021 to December 24, 2021, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Oct 27 2021Application (21A115) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 24, 2021.
Dec 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2022 to February 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 14, 2022, for all respondents.
Dec 22 2021Waiver of right of respondent VLSI Technology LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Unified Patents, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2022Brief of respondent Federal Respondent in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentOther
Mar 01 2022Reply of petitioner Intel Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Catherine Mary Agnes Carroll
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

catherine.carroll@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Intel Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents
Nathan Nobu Lowenstein
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein & Weatherwax LLP
1880 Century Park East, Suite 815
Los Angeles, CA 90067

lowenstein@lowensteinweatherwax.com
3108671030
Party name: VLSI Technology LLC
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondent
Other
William G. Jenks
    Counsel of Record
Jenks IP Law
1629 K St NW
Suite 300
washington, DC 20006

wjenks@jenksiplaw.com
2024127964
Party name: Unified Patents, LLC, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543