Docket for 21-8279 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 27 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 29, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetition | Jul 13 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 29, 2022 to August 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 14 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 19, 2022. | | | Aug 19 2022 | Brief of respondent Arkansas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 08 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. | | | Oct 03 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|