SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-8263 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-8263 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
John Matthias Watson, III, Petitioner
v.
Nevada
Docketed:
June 29, 2022
Linked with 21A637
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Nevada
Case Numbers:
(78780)
Decision Date:
December 13, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
February 10, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 18 2022
Application (21A637) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 11, 2022 to July 10, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Apr 25 2022
Application (21A637) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 10, 2022.
Jun 24 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 29, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 27 2022
Brief of respondent Nevada in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 02 2022
Reply of petitioner John Matthias Watson, III filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 11 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jamie J. Resch
Counsel of Record
Resch Law, PLLC
2620 Regatta Dr. #102
Las Vegas, NV 89128
jresch@convictionsolutions.com
7024837360
Party name: John Matthias Watson, III
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan Eugene VanBoskerck
Counsel of Record
District Attorney Clark County Nevada
200 Lewis Ave.
Las Vegas, NV 89155-2212
Jonathan.VanBoskerck@clarkcountyda.com
(702) 671-2794
Party name: The State of Nevada
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##