SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-8243 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-8243 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Michael Shane Bargo, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
June 28, 2022
Linked with 21A545
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC19-1744)
Decision Date:
June 24, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
January 26, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 23 2022
Application (21A545) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 26, 2022 to June 25, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 28 2022
Application (21A545) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 25, 2022.
Jun 24 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 28, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 26 2022
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 08 2022
Reply of petitioner Michael Bargo filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 11 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Robert Gemmer
Counsel of Record
939 Beach Drive N.E.
Unit 404
Saint Petersburg,, FL 33701
dgemmer01@gmail.com
7274188620
Party name: Michael Bargo
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##