SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-8177 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-8177 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Marlin Larice Joseph, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
June 17, 2022
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC20-1741)
Decision Date:
February 10, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
March 21, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 18, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 18 2022
Brief of Florida in opposition not accepted for filing. (July 21, 2022 -- corrected version to be submitted)
Jul 18 2022
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Other
Aug 04 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Fredrick Robert Susaneck
Counsel of Record
Levine & Susaneck, P.A.
P.O. Box 1313
West Palm Beach, FL 33402
levine.susaneck@gmail.com
(561) 351-7592
Party name: Marlin Joseph
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##