Docket for 21-8046 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 14 2022 | Application (21A518) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 5, 2022 to June 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 14 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 5, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 17 2022 | Application (21A518) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 4, 2022. | | | Jun 24 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2022 to August 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 27 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 4, 2022. | | | Jul 29 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 4, 2022 to August 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 24, 2022. | | | Aug 19 2022 | Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Sep 01 2022 | Reply of petitioner Joseph Danks filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 08 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. | | | Oct 03 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|