Docket for 21-7850 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Feb 18 2022 | Application (21A496) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 7, 2022 to May 6, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Mar 14 2022 | Application (21A496) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until May 6, 2022. | | | May 06 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 13, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | May 17 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 13, 2022 to July 13, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 18 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 13, 2022. | | | Jun 14 2022 | Brief of respondent Tim Shoop, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 21 2022 | Reply of petitioner Nawaz Ahmed filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 30 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. | | | Oct 03 2022 | The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. | | |
|