Docket for 21-7584 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 23 2021 | Application (21A300) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 11, 2022 to March 11, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main Document | Jan 10 2022 | Application (21A300) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 11, 2022. | | | Mar 11 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 11, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | May 11 2022 | Brief of respondent South Carolina in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 24 2022 | Reply of petitioner William Dickerson filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 25 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022. | | | Jun 13 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|