SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-7388 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-7388 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Amos Joseph Wells, III, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:
March 16, 2022
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
Case Numbers:
(WR-86,184-01)
Decision Date:
December 15, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 15, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Apr 11 2022
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 25 2022
Reply of petitioner Amos Wells filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Other
Apr 27 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ashley Rae Steele
Counsel of Record
Texas Office of Capital and Forensic Writs
1700 N Congress Suite 460
Austin, TX 78701
ashley.steele@ocfw.texas.gov
5124638541
Party name: Amos Wells
Attorneys for Respondent
Victoria Ann Ford Oblon
Counsel of Record
Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney's Office
401 W. Belknap
Fort Worth, TX 76196
vafordoblon@tarrantcountytx.gov
7177561287
Party name: State of Texas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##