Docket for 21-7381 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 06 2022 | Application (21A310) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2022 to March 4, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 11 2022 | Application (21A310) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 4, 2022. | | | Mar 04 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 15, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 21 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2022 to May 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 22 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 16, 2022. | | | Apr 15 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 16 2022 | Brief of respondent Timothy Hooper, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 27 2022 | Reply of petitioner Jessie Hoffman, Jr. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 01 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022. | | | Jun 21 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|