Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-7379
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-7379
Title:Patrick Joseph Terry, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:March 16, 2022
Linked with 21A290
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2018-1076)
   Decision Date:October 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2021Application (21A290) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 4, 2022 to March 5, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 04 2022Application (21A290) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until March 5, 2022.
Mar 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 15, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 27 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Joseph Terry1011 S. Muskogee Avenue
Tahlequah, OK 74464

Party name: Patrick Joseph Terry

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543