SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-7335 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-7335 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Charles Don Flores, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:
March 10, 2022
Linked with 21A219
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
Case Numbers:
(WR-64,654-03)
Decision Date:
October 6, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 09 2021
Application (21A219) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 4, 2022 to March 5, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Dec 15 2021
Application (21A219) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 4, 2022.
Mar 04 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 11, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 04 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2022 to May 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 05 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2022.
May 11 2022
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 24 2022
Reply of petitioner Charles Flores filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 25 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gretchen S. Sween
Counsel of Record
Sween Law
PO Box 5083
Austin, TX 78763-5083
gsweenlaw@gmail.com
2145575779
Party name: Charles Flores
Attorneys for Respondent
Michele O'Brien Yeatts
Counsel of Record
Dallas County District Attorney
133 North Riverfront Blvd., LB-19
Dallas, TX 75207-4399
syeatts@dallascounty.org
214-653-3630
Party name: Texas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##