SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-7300 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-7300 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
LeMaricus Davidson, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:
March 8, 2022
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Eastern Division
Case Numbers:
(E2019-00541-CCA-R3-PD)
Decision Date:
August 19, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
December 8, 2021
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 7, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Apr 05 2022
Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 14 2022
Reply of petitioner LeMaricus Davidson filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 21 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Deborah Yvonne Drew
Counsel of Record
Tennessee Office of the Post Conviction Defender
P.O. Box 198068
Nashville, TN 37219-8068
DrewD@tnpcdo.net
6157419423
Party name: LeMaricus Davidson
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Craig Coulam
Counsel of Record
State of Tennessee Attorney General's Office
425 Fifth Avenue, North; P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202-0207
andrew.coulam@ag.tn.gov
6157411868
Party name: State of Tennessee
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##